Gandhi, Mohammad Suhail (CPSO#: 62428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stayner Medical Centre
P O Box 220
Stayner ON  L0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 428-3246
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 1005
74 Cedar Pointe Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 5R7
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-7775
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. S. Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gandhi ( CPSO# 62428 )

Business Address:
Stayner Medical Centre
7477 Highway 26 North
PO Box 220
Stayner ON  L0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 428-3246

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W6
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
74 Cedar Pointe Drive
Sutie 1005
Barrie ON  L4N 5R7
Phone Number: (705) 721-7775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SUHAIL GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991