Gandhi, Sanjiv Karamchand (CPSO#: 74710)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiothoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2012