Gandhi, Shital (CPSO#: 69276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 431
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4857
Fax: (416) 586-5377
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shital Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandhi ( CPSO# 69276 )

Business Address:
200 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Suite 431
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4857

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHITAL GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999