Gandilo, Sargon Benjamin (CPSO#: 32722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kanata Imaging
150 Katimavik Road
Kanata ON  K2L 2N2
Phone: (613) 592-1607
Fax: (613) 592-1412
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4456 LIMEBANK RD
MANOTICK ON
Manotick ON  K1X 1E8
Canada
Phone: 613 425-0588
Fax: 613 692-0732
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sargon B. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandilo ( CPSO# 32722 )
Dr. M. Daryawish ( CPSO# 25415 )

Business Address:
4456 Limebank Road
Gloucester ON  K1X 1E8
Phone Number: (613) 425-0588

Business Address:
B2 - 770 Boradview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7K2

Business Address:
2246 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 1A4

Business Address:
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6

Business Address:
CML Kanata Health Imaging Centre
Suite 102
150 Katimavik Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 2N2

Business Address:
Nepean Imaging Centre
106 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 723-5215

Business Address:
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8


Corporation Name: Sargon Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandilo ( CPSO# 32722 )

Business Address:
150 Katimavik Road
Suite 102
Kanata ON  K2L 2N2

Business Address:
4456 Limebank Road
Gloucester ON  K1X 1E8
Phone Number: (613) 425-0588

Business Address:
B2 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7K2

Business Address:
2246 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 1A4

Business Address:
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 106
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 723-5215

Business Address:
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARGON BENJAMIN GANDILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDILO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1981