Gandy, Hazen Morrison (CPSO#: 58851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3740
Fax: (613) 738-4202
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Gandy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gandy ( CPSO# 58851 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAZEN MORRISON GANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987