Ganesan, Ramakrishnan (CPSO#: 64190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: Ganesan, Ramakrishan (used until: 02 Jul 1991 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite G
960 Cumberland Avenue
Burlington ON  L7N 3J6
Phone: (905) 639-8566
Fax: (905) 639-7966
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Ganesan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ganesan ( CPSO# 64190 )

Business Address:
Suite G
960 Cumberland Avenue
Burlington ON  L7N 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 639-8566

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 11 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMAKRISHNAN GANESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANESAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992