Gangbar, Eric Wolfe (CPSO#: 58012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yiddish

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-6641
Fax: (905) 737-8285
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC WOLFE GANGBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGBAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009