Gangji, Azim S. (CPSO#: 73750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Marion Wing #M302
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33386
Fax: (905) 308-7222
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azim S. Gangji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gangji ( CPSO# 73750 )

Business Address:
Department of Nephrology
St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZIM S. GANGJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2003