Gangolli, Vinodkumar (CPSO#: 52596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: (519) 749-4289
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINODKUMAR GANGOLLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGOLLI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1991