Ganguli, Satyajit Nimu (CPSO#: 68092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hosptial
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58557
Fax: 9054946614
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Myhealth PET Centre
6870 Goreway dr. Unit 101
Mississauga, Ont
L4V1P4
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-1593
Fax: (416) 926-8768
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Lighthouse Imaging Finch Site
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite LL04
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 293-5940
Fax: (416) 292-6036
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

lighthouse imaging
5 Fairview mall Drive
suit100/105
North York ON  M2Z2Z1
Canada
Phone: 4164993559
Fax: 4164994631
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

18 826 King St. North
Waterloo Nuclear and Radiography
Waterloo ON  N2J 4G8
Canada
Phone: 519-206-7777
Fax: (519) 206-7778
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Finchgate xray and ultrasound
40 Finchgate BLVD
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: 9057928440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Dixie xray associates
8333 Weston Road
Vaughan ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: 9058507478
Fax: 9058506934
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nimu Ganguli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ganguli ( CPSO# 68092 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 953-7209

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATYAJIT NIMU GANGULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGULI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999