Gannage, Christopher (CPSO#: 59373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health
Centre - Emergency Department
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2216
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Gannage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2008

Dr. C. Gannage ( CPSO# 59373 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Emergency Room
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 16 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GANNAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1989