Gannage, John Michael (CPSO#: 62612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Main Street Markham North
Ground Floor
Markham ON  L3P 1Y8
Phone: (905) 294-2335
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Gannage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gannage ( CPSO# 62612 )

Business Address:
300 Main Street North
Ground Floor
Markham ON  L3P 1Y8
Phone Number: (905) 294-2335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL GANNAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991