Gannon, William Augustine (CPSO#: 28762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 344-8849
Fax: (519) 344-8840
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William A. Gannon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Gannon ( CPSO# 28762 )

Business Address:
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 344-8849

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM AUGUSTINE GANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1976