Gantous, Andres Michel (CPSO#: 62998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Wing West
Suite 230
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6659
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-3900
Fax: (416) 323-1344
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

30 Bond St.
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416 864 5833
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andres Gantous Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gantous ( CPSO# 62998 )

Business Address:
M110 - 150 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2X9
Phone Number: (416) 926-3838

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Suite 230
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6659

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRES MICHEL GANTOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTOUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 01 Oct 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1994