Garba, Sule (CPSO#: 64658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ahmadu Bello University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
Department of General Surgery
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SULE GARBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007