Garbedian, Kimberley (CPSO#: 82673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: Beardsley, Kimberley (used until: 28 Jul 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hannam Fertility Centre/TNI
160 Bloor Street East, 15th Floor
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone: (416) 595-1521
Fax: (416) 506-0680
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn Garbedian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Garbedian ( CPSO# 82543 )
Dr. K. Garbedian ( CPSO# 82673 )

Business Address:
226 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 850-6681


Corporation Name: Dr. Kimberley Garbedian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Garbedian ( CPSO# 82673 )

Business Address:
Hannam Fertility Centre / TNI
160 Bloor Street East
15th Floor
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone Number: (416) 595-1521

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY GARBEDIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBEDIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2012