Garber, Bryan Gordon (CPSO#: 57167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DMH
CF H Svcs Gp HQ
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 901-9594
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN GORDON GARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1987