Garbharran, Hari Narain (CPSO#: 78987)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Natal, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hari N. Garbharran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 44 Castlemore Avenue, Markham, ON L6L 2G2
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2015