Garceau, Patrick (CPSO#: 87110)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Laval University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2010