Garcia Ameijeiras, Maria De Los Angeles (CPSO#: 64549)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Barcelona, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garcia Ameijeiras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For Inactive files please contact Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5G2 For Active files please contact Dr. Dallas Seitz, Providence Care, 752 King Street West, Kingston, ON K7L 4X3
Date Received: 05 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Oct 2016