Garcia, Andrea Michelle (CPSO#: 91783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
79 dundas street west suite 104/105
Mississauga ON  L5B 1H7
Phone: (905) 275-1309
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

79 dundas street west suite 104/105
Mississauga ON  L5B 1H7
Canada
Phone: (905) 275-1309
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Michelle Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Garcia ( CPSO# 91783 )

Business Address:
79 Dundas Street West
Suite 104/105
Mississauga ON  L5B 1H7
Phone Number: (905) 275-1309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MICHELLE GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2012