Garcia, Francisco Javier (CPSO#: 88334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: 306-267-2131
Electoral District: 08

Medical Records Location

Address: St Joseph's Health Care 4th Floor Urology 268 Grosvenor Street London, ON N6A 4V2
Instructions: Medical records are with Dr. Gerald Brock
Date Received: 27 May 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCISCO JAVIER GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016