Garcia Osogobio, Sandra Minerva (CPSO#: 87460)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Autonomous University of Puebla, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 04 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008