Garcia Pan, Luis Cesar (CPSO#: 55290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cesar Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 18, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Luis Cesar Garcia
            Pan, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Garcia Pan to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Garcia Pan has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.  Should he decide to return to practise, Dr. Garcia Pan
                  will provide the College with notice in writing of his intention to do so
                  not later than eight (8) weeks prior to returning to the practise of
                  medicine in any jurisdiction and will abide by any reasonable request
                  made by the Inquires, Complaints, and Reports Committee associated with
                  his return to practise.