Garcia, Susana Gan (CPSO#: 92012)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Far Eastern University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010