Garcia Yaya, Diana Esperanza (CPSO#: 107612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Univ. Pedagogica y Tech. de Colombia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 705 743-2121
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA ESPERANZA GARCIA YAYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA YAYA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2016 to 21 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015