Garcia-Horton, Alejandro (CPSO#: 104183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine, Rm E6-117
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519)663-3584
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEJANDRO GARCIA-HORTON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GARCIA-HORTON is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. GARCIA-HORTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GARCIA-HORTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GARCIA-HORTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GARCIA-HORTON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GARCIA-HORTON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018