Gardiner, Ian Cameron (CPSO#: 60844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 715
1001 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5S 3A6
Phone: 4163233784
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Gardiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN CAMERON GARDINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDINER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1990