Gardiner, Jane Alexandra (CPSO#: 56674)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999