Gardner, Charles Edward (CPSO#: 68725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka District Health Unit
15 Sperling Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6K9
Phone: (705) 721-7520 Ext. 7219
Fax: (705) 721-1495
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES EDWARD GARDNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1995