Gardner, Robert Martin (CPSO#: 21805)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients can send medical records request to: Trillium Health Centre 100 Queensway West Mississauga, ON L5B 1B8 Tel: (905) 848-7580
Date Received: 07 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 2013