Gardner-Nix, Jacqueline Sally (CPSO#: 51854)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: Gardner, Jacqueline Sally (used until: 29 Aug 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pain Clinic - Dept of Anaesthesia
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 461-4333
Fax: (416) 261-9144
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

909-1201 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1S2
Canada
Phone: 416 461 4333
Fax: 416 261 9144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gardner-Nix Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 22 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SALLY GARDNER-NIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDNER-NIX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013