Gare, Douglas John (CPSO#: 18195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 1962

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1962

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 813-2288
Fax: (416) 813-4179
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOHN GARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1962

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Sep 1983
Summary:

 In September 1983, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gare guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, in that he failed to carry out the terms of an agreement 
 with a patient, contrary to s. 27(10); and in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice 
 of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Gare be 
 reprimanded, and that his licence to practise medicine be suspended for thirty days.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 21 Feb 1985
Hearing Date(s): 19 Sep 1983