Gareau, Rejean Antoine (CPSO#: 82861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anestesiology
Room B307 Mail Stop 249
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rejean Gareau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gareau ( CPSO# 82861 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B307, Mail Stop 249
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REJEAN ANTOINE GAREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010