Garfinkle, Miriam (CPSO#: 30855)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Regent Park Community Health Centre 465 Dundas Street East Toronto, ON M5A 2B2
Date Received: 28 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015