Garg, Avinash (CPSO#: 55425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 307
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 523-4400
Fax: (705) 523-4050
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avinash Garg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Garg ( CPSO# 55425 )

Business Address:
307 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 523-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVINASH GARG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1989