Garg, Sunil (CPSO#: 84212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 3C.10
650 16th Avenue
Lachine QC  H8S 3N5
Phone: 5146372351 Ext. 77250
Fax: 5146370951

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNIL GARG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 22 May 2006 to 04 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008