Garg, Swarn Kanta (CPSO#: 50622)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute 550 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 2A2
Date Received: 17 Apr 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014