Gargaun, Serghei (CPSO#: 78705)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004