Gargoum, Hassan Abdulla Mohamed (CPSO#: 85939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: Mohamed, Hassan Abdalla (used until: 29 Jun 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2275 Broad Street
Regina SK  S4P 1Y7
Phone: (306) 757-2478
Fax: (306) 585-3993

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN ABDULLA MOHAMED GARGOUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARGOUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2007