Garland, Jocelyn Suzanne (CPSO#: 71336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Room 2043
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-3207
Fax: (613) 533-2306
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jocelyn S. Garland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Garland ( CPSO# 71336 )

Business Address:
2043 - 76 Stuart Street
Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-3207

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOCELYN SUZANNE GARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001