Garland, Marie Sonali (CPSO#: 68786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: D'Souza, Marie Sonali (used until: 17 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Hospital Medicine
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 2128
Fax: 9056814964
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. S. Garland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Garland ( CPSO# 68786 )

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE SONALI GARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997