Garniss, Derek Arie (CPSO#: 77690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie, Ontario
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Garniss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Garniss ( CPSO# 77690 )
Dr. S. Wallenius ( CPSO# 79485 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 5A3
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK ARIE GARNISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARNISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004