Garraway, Naisan Robert (CPSO#: 69064)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 2000