Garrels, Kristina Lynn (CPSO#: 70219)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2005