Garrity, James (CPSO#: 20627)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998