Gartenberg, David Samuel (CPSO#: 25716)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Mar 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2014