Gartha, Ivan Victor (CPSO#: 17325)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Franz Joseph University of Kolozsvar, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993