Garvin, Gregory John (CPSO#: 59513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Fax: (519) 646-6204
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Garvin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Garvin ( CPSO# 59513 )

Business Address:
1657 Dundas Street
London ON  N5W 3C6
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Business Address:
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H1
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6035

Business Address:
Suite 104
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-2900

Business Address:
Suite 105
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN GARVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARVIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1992