Gashlan, Maha Mohammed (CPSO#: 70762)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999